U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00353-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Corona-Herrera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss Counts]
  • April 02, 2025: [Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Exclude]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.