U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Daubert Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [RETIRED Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Private]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on FPD Motion for Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 28, 2025: [Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis- FPD]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on FPD Motion for Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 25, 2025: [Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis- FPD]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Disclose Grand Jury]
  • April 11, 2025: [Disclose Grand Jury]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 09, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Daubert Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on FPD Motion for Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 12, 2025: [RETIRED Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Private]
  • March 12, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • March 11, 2025: [Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis- FPD]
  • March 11, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • March 09, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • February 26, 2025: [In Limine]
  • February 25, 2025: [Issuance of Subpoena In Forma Pauperis- FPD]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.