U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00390-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Conner et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Excuse]
  • May 01, 2025: [Excuse]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 15, 2025: [Modify]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Travel ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.