U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00320-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bernard, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [In Limine]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on on CJA Motion for Issuance of Subpoena]
  • April 25, 2025: [Issuance of Subpoena - CJA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on on CJA Motion for Issuance of Subpoena]
  • April 24, 2025: [Issuance of Subpoena - CJA]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on on CJA Motion for Issuance of Subpoena]
  • April 22, 2025: [Issuance of Subpoena - CJA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
February, 2025
  • February 26, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • February 06, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.