U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 18, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Non-Guideline Sentence]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.