U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10274-
  • Case Name: Roberta Ann Vigil-Moreno
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Dismiss Case and 9013-1.1 Notice (Chapter 13 Trustee)(Batch)(Failure To Make Plan Payments)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [3015 Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Claimant's Notice of Mortgage Payment Changes]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Confirmation Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.