U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-16355-
  • Case Name: Aaron Wittenburg and Brenda Gayle Wittenburg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Virtual Order: Confirming Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Verification of Confirmable Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Leave to File Claim After Claims Bar Date/Amended Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Certificate of Non-Contested Matter]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Reschedule Hearing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Confirmation Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.