U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10765-
  • Case Name: Scott Allen Dunsbergen and Christine Louise Dunsbergen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Chapter 13 Notice of Financial Management and/or Domestic Support Obligation Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [3015 Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Reinstate Case]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Dismissing Case]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M [Objection to Confirmation/Modification of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.