U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-16395-
  • Case Name: Jung Myung Koh and Stephanie Karola Koh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Chapter 13 Fees and Expenses (Application) and Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Compliance With Rules]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Verification of Confirmable Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [3015 Notice]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.