U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11655
  • Case Name: Julian Hector Revolie
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Payment of Installment Payment (Chapter 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [4001-1.1 Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Extend the Automatic Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Entry re: Prior Filing (ADI)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor's Tax Documents]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Individual Debtors Only)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income & Commitment Period Form (122C-1)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Social Security Number]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.