U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11653-
  • Case Name: 210 8th St LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Set Bar Date For Filing Proofs of Claim/Administrative Proofs of Claim]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing (Bankruptcy)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Regarding Receivers (Chapter 11)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Resolution]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Equity Security Holders]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.