U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11649-
  • Case Name: Michael Ray Kenney
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Meeting of Creditors Satisfied]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Individual Debtors Only)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Entry re: Prior Filing (ADI)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Auto Assignment of Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income Form (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Individual Debtors Only)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rodriguez, Simon E. [Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.