U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10451-
  • Case Name: Pearlie J. Dizon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Chapter 13 Notice of Financial Management and/or Domestic Support Obligation Certificate]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Confirmation Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.