U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11626-
  • Case Name: Janette Rene Applegate
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Claimant's Notice Request]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Entry re: Prior Filing (ADI)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Kiel, Douglas B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.