U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11625-
  • Case Name: Ironwood Group, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [9013-1.1 Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss or Convert (Chapter 11)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Trustee's Continued Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7, 11, 12]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compliance With Rules]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.