U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11683-
  • Case Name: Canyon Creek Villas LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing (Bankruptcy)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Deficiency]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.