U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11672-
  • Case Name: Judith Ione Nagel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Personal Financial Management Course]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Schedule I]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Employee Pay Advice/Income Record and/or Statement Concerning No Employee Income Record]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Schedule J-2]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Schedule H]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Schedule D And/Or Schedule E/F]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Statement of Intent]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Receipt of First Installment Payment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Notice of Deficiency]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sender, Harvey [Entry re: Prior Filing (ADI)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.