U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00033-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Sisneros, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.