U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03089
  • Case Name: Fitzgerald v. Regional Transportation District
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.