U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03588
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Stancil et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • April 04, 2025: [Minute Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.