U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01339
  • Case Name: Groves v. City of Fort Collins et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to Restrict]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.