U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00483
  • Case Name: Hyland v. Gogo Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.