U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00317
  • Case Name: Lindberg v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 06, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.