U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00910
  • Case Name: Pan v. Atlas Real Estate Group LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.