U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01053
  • Case Name: Campbell Development Group LLC v. United States Liability Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.