U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01122
  • Case Name: Kettering (PS) v. Larimer County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.