U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00721
  • Case Name: 2955 Vallejo Street, LLC v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • April 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.