U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01163
  • Case Name: D.B.U. et al v. Trump et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 14, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • April 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.