U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-01164
  • Case Name: Hoid et al (PS) v. KNOP-2 News et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appoint Pro Bono Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.