U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Colorado

colorado Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Colorado
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00556
  • Case Name: Purdy et al v. Jefferson County, Colorado et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 27, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.