U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Illarramendi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • July 15, 2020: [USM Return Unexecuted]
  • July 02, 2020: [Writ Issued]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 29, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 29, 2020: [Application for Writ]
  • June 29, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2015: [Release from Custody ]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • September 03, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 10, 2015: [Reply to Response]
July, 2015
  • July 17, 2015: [CJA 21 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2015
  • June 29, 2015: [Transcript]
  • June 22, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • June 18, 2015: [Transcript]
  • June 17, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 17, 2015: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 16, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
June, 2014
  • June 04, 2014: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.