U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 06, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 18, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order of Transfer]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Summons Issued]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: [USM Return Unexecuted]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Compliance Review Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • January 18, 2018: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • January 17, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 22, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 07, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 06, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2014
  • June 09, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.