U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • June 11, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Sealed Document]
July, 2016
  • July 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • June 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 24, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 24, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 24, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 18, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • June 18, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 18, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Bond Hearing]
  • August 12, 2015: [PS 8 Petition Action on Cond of PT Release]
  • August 12, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2015
  • July 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
June, 2015
  • June 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2014
  • June 09, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.