U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00282-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zaleski
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Instrument Returned]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • December 04, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Instrument Returned]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Exoneration of Bond]
  • November 08, 2018: [Exoneration of Bond]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 05, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 16, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 15, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 08, 2016: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Exhibit List]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 03, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 20, 2016: [Status Conference]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 31, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order]
  • March 03, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • March 02, 2016: [Reply/Response Misc]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Leave to File]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 26, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 26, 2016: [Extension of Time]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • December 21, 2015: [Transcript]
  • December 03, 2015: [Affidavit]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • October 28, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 19, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 19, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Reconsideration]
  • August 31, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2015: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2014
  • June 11, 2014: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.