U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-00170-7
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • December 04, 2018: [Passport Returned]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • November 01, 2018: [Passport Returned]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • November 07, 2016: [Passport Returned]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 13, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sealed Document]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • August 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 01, 2016: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 01, 2016: [USM Return Unexecuted]
  • April 01, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2016: [Writ Returned]
  • March 24, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 11, 2016: [Writ Returned]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Writ Issued]
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • February 17, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • February 17, 2016: [Seal]
  • February 17, 2016: [Application for Writ]
July, 2014
  • July 18, 2014: [Writ Returned]
June, 2014
  • June 11, 2014: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.