U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Writ Returned]
  • November 04, 2022: [Writ Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Writ Issued]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • September 30, 2022: [Seal]
  • September 30, 2022: [Application for Writ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
June, 2014
  • June 11, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.