U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00057-13
  • Case Name: USA v. Arzuaga et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Passport Returned]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 06, 2017: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 06, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 06, 2017: [Seal]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2015
  • March 02, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
February, 2015
  • February 04, 2015: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
October, 2014
  • October 23, 2014: [USM Return Executed]
June, 2014
  • June 11, 2014: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.