U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dobuzinsky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • December 09, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 09, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • November 02, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Transcript]
  • October 21, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order of Transfer]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2015
  • August 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • August 10, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2014
  • June 13, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.