U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vucci
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Prob 35 Order Term Probation / SR]
  • July 13, 2018: [Travel ]
  • July 03, 2018: [Travel ]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Travel ]
  • May 01, 2018: [Travel ]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Travel ]
  • March 13, 2018: [Travel ]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Travel ]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Travel ]
February, 2017
  • February 01, 2017: [Travel ]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Travel ]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Travel ]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • June 09, 2016: [Travel ]
June, 2014
  • June 13, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.