U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00100-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Forbes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 12, 2022: [USCA Order]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 03, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Clerk's Certificate Re: Notice of Appeal]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • February 02, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 21, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 05, 2021: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • January 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 23, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 22, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • July 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 26, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 15, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • June 01, 2020: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: [Transcript]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Transcript]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [2255 Motion Filed]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Restitution Order]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 05, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 05, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 15, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 15, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • June 06, 2017: [Sealed Document]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 25, 2017: [Seal]
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • May 18, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 02, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 02, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 26, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • April 06, 2017: [Transcript]
  • April 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 05, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 05, 2017: [Seal]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 13, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 09, 2017: [Extension of Time]
  • March 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continue ]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order]
  • January 19, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • January 19, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2017: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • January 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 19, 2017: [Consent Form]
  • January 16, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 16, 2017: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • January 13, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 11, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 08, 2017: [Transcript]
  • January 06, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 06, 2017: [Jury Selection]
  • January 04, 2017: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • January 03, 2017: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • January 02, 2017: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 30, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 23, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 23, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • December 23, 2016: [Brady Materials]
  • December 23, 2016: [Order of Transfer]
  • December 22, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge]
  • December 22, 2016: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 22, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • December 22, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 21, 2016: [In Limine ]
  • December 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 13, 2016: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • December 13, 2016: [Status Conference]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Transcript]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 12, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2016: [Continue ]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 09, 2016: [Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam ]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 07, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property ]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 22, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 06, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 03, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 02, 2016: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • June 02, 2016: [Continue ]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Continue ]
  • May 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Continue ]
  • April 28, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 08, 2016: [Transcript]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 16, 2016: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • February 12, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 08, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • February 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • February 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 02, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 28, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 22, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 21, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • January 14, 2016: [Seal]
  • January 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 14, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order Referring Plea]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 12, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
December, 2015
  • December 30, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 07, 2015: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2015: [Pretrial Conference]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 20, 2015: [Continue ]
  • November 03, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 29, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 28, 2015: [Continue ]
  • October 20, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 14, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 24, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 18, 2015: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 16, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 11, 2015: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 04, 2015: [Continue ]
August, 2015
  • August 30, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 28, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2015: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • August 25, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 24, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 21, 2015: [Order Referring Plea]
  • August 20, 2015: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 10, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 17, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 13, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 08, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2014
  • September 30, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2014
  • June 19, 2014: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2014: [Order]
  • June 13, 2014: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.