U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Suarez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 19, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 14, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 14, 2022: [Violation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 19, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 19, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • February 09, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • February 04, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 31, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 06, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 03, 2021: [Violation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 01, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Compliance Review Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 10, 2021: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 22, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 05, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice]
  • December 01, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • September 29, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 29, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • September 18, 2020: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Violation Report]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 30, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 30, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 28, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • January 21, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Status Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 24, 2019: [Transcript]
  • December 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order]
  • December 13, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 13, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 09, 2019: [Bail Information Sheet]
  • December 09, 2019: [Surety Information Sheet]
  • December 09, 2019: [Bond]
  • December 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 09, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 09, 2019: [Arrest ]
  • December 09, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2014
  • June 13, 2014: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.