U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crespo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • August 02, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [2255 Motion Filed]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Passport Returned]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • November 10, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 06, 2015: [Reply to Response]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • October 16, 2015: [Bond]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Index to Record on Appeal]
  • July 27, 2015: [Transcript]
  • July 06, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 06, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 02, 2015: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 01, 2015: [Sealed Order]
  • July 01, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • July 01, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 26, 2015: [Reply/Response Misc]
  • June 22, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 22, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2014
  • June 13, 2014: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.