U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haugabook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 16, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 17, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Calendar Entry]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • December 11, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
June, 2014
  • June 13, 2014: [Electronic Filing Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.