U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00039-9
  • Case Name: USA v. Easterling et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 21, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 18, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 15, 2022: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 02, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2021: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 24, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 13, 2021: [Continue ]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 29, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 29, 2021: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2021: [Continue ]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • January 26, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 30, 2020: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • November 30, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Order on Motion regarding Reduction of Sentence re First Step Act]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • June 12, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 11, 2020: [Seal]
  • June 05, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • May 01, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Letter]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 21, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • January 16, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • January 15, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • November 13, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • November 12, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • November 12, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 14, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • August 13, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 05, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 05, 2019: [Violation Report]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 05, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 31, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • January 30, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • January 28, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 28, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2019: [Revocation of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • January 25, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 14, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 09, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 09, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • January 09, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 09, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 09, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • January 08, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 07, 2019: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2019: [Calendar Entry]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2018: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 11, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 11, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 18, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 12, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 12, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 04, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • June 04, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 01, 2018: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 01, 2018: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 31, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 31, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 31, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 31, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 11, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • May 01, 2018: [Sealed Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 03, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Continue ]
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 29, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 27, 2018: [Continue ]
  • March 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 27, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • March 27, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 26, 2018: [Pretrial Detention]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • October 31, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • June 02, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 15, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 08, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • May 08, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 04, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2017: [Pretrial Detention]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 24, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • April 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2017: [USM Return Unexecuted]
March, 2017
  • March 20, 2017: [Sealed Order]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 10, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 08, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Payment]
  • January 11, 2017: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 04, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • January 04, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
  • January 04, 2017: [Release from Custody ]
December, 2016
  • December 31, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 28, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 28, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • December 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 28, 2016: [Pretrial Detention]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • November 03, 2016: [Sealed Order]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • October 26, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 26, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • October 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • October 25, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • October 25, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [Arrest ]
  • October 24, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Order Returning Submission]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 20, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • April 20, 2016: [Appoint Counsel re Reduction of Sentence - USSC Amendment]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 21, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • January 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 14, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
October, 2015
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Interim Payment]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Status Conference]
  • September 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • September 02, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order]
  • August 03, 2015: [Transcript]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • July 29, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • July 24, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 24, 2015: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • July 02, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • July 02, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2015
  • June 30, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 18, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 17, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 16, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 15, 2015: [Status Conference]
July, 2014
  • July 29, 2014: [Continue ]
  • July 10, 2014: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2014
  • June 26, 2014: [Transcript]
  • June 25, 2014: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 13, 2014: [Order on Motion for Interim Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.