U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00146-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Re: Due Process Protections Act of 2020]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 30, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 30, 2022: [Arrest ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 26, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 22, 2022: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • July 22, 2022: [Indictment]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Bond]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 18, 2021: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 18, 2021: [Violation Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 15, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 15, 2021: [USM Return Executed]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • June 14, 2021: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • June 11, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • August 14, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • August 13, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • August 11, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • July 14, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • July 14, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 10, 2020: [Hearing ]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice Regarding Hearing Via Zoom]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 01, 2020: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • June 23, 2020: [Violation Report]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • May 09, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 09, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • May 03, 2019: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • April 26, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • April 23, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • April 22, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • March 12, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • February 25, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • February 25, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Document]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 19, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • September 13, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • September 11, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Early Termination of Probation]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 29, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2018: [Arrest ]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 22, 2018: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • May 16, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Hearing ]
  • May 08, 2018: [Release from Custody ]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: [Prob 12B Req to Modify Cond of Supervision]
  • April 03, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • March 22, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 21, 2018: [USM Return Executed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 20, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 16, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Arrest ]
  • February 15, 2018: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • February 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 14, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • February 13, 2018: [Violation Report]
  • February 12, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 21, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 05, 2017: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • October 05, 2017: [Calendar Entry]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 07, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • August 29, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 29, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 29, 2017: [Seal]
  • August 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 23, 2017: [Violation Report]
  • August 21, 2017: [Search Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 18, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 19, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 18, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 05, 2017: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 05, 2017: [Violation Report]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2017: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 06, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • January 03, 2017: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • December 21, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • December 20, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • December 16, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • December 14, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • December 01, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Transcript]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • September 23, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 19, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 19, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • September 15, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 15, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • September 14, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 26, 2016: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • August 26, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • August 24, 2016: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 13, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • July 08, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • July 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • July 07, 2016: [Violation Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 06, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 06, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • June 27, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 23, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • June 08, 2016: [Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Probation Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2016: [Prob 12N Petition for Action Request for Compliance Review Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 01, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • June 01, 2016: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • May 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • May 05, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 11, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • April 09, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 06, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 06, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • April 04, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • April 03, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 03, 2016: [Seal]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2016: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • March 11, 2016: [Dismiss ]
  • March 11, 2016: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • March 11, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 09, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 09, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 08, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 21, 2016: [Continue ]
  • February 05, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • February 05, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2016
  • January 23, 2016: [Continue ]
  • January 19, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • December 22, 2015: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2015: [Continue ]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 19, 2015: [Continue ]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 18, 2015: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 04, 2015: [Continue ]
  • September 02, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion to proceed IFP]
  • August 27, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 27, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • August 27, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • August 27, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 26, 2015: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • August 25, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • August 20, 2015: [~Util - Set/Reset Sentencing Scheduling Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 17, 2015: [Transcript]
  • August 14, 2015: [Continue ]
  • August 12, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • August 11, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2015
  • July 22, 2015: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • July 21, 2015: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 20, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 17, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 14, 2015: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • July 13, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • July 10, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 10, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • July 10, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 10, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • July 10, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 01, 2015: [Seal]
  • July 01, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order Returning Submission]
  • June 15, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2014
  • June 22, 2014: [Extension of Time]
  • June 18, 2014: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 17, 2014: [Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2014: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.