U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00008-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hils et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 04, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [2255 Motion Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 09, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Transcript]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Transcript]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Restitution Order]
July, 2015
  • July 02, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 02, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2015: [Continue ]
June, 2015
  • June 19, 2015: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal]
  • June 19, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 18, 2015: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • June 15, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • June 12, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2015: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2015: [Order]
June, 2014
  • June 16, 2014: [Order on Motion to Incur Expenses]
  • June 16, 2014: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.