U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00198-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • February 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • February 19, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • January 24, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • January 23, 2020: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • January 13, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 23, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • May 20, 2019: [Violation Report]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
  • April 03, 2019: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • April 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 02, 2019: [Arrest ]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [USM Return Executed]
  • November 08, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 03, 2016: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 03, 2016: [Violation Report]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 28, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 28, 2016: [Calendar Entry]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 28, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Sealed Document]
  • October 28, 2015: [Order Revoking Supervised Release]
  • October 27, 2015: [Revocation of Supervised Release Hearing (other than Initial Appearance)]
  • October 14, 2015: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • October 14, 2015: [Violation Report]
  • October 05, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
June, 2015
  • June 16, 2015: [USM Return Executed]
December, 2014
  • December 16, 2014: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2014
  • July 31, 2014: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2014
  • June 16, 2014: [Dismiss ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.