U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Glenn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Prob 12F Modification of Monetary Condition]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 04, 2021: [Seal]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2014
  • June 16, 2014: [Calendar Entry]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.