U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:13-cr-00225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trinidad et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Restitution Order]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Unredacted Judge's Signature]
  • November 29, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • November 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 17, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 17, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 17, 2017: [Dismiss ]
  • November 17, 2017: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 08, 2017: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 01, 2017: [Sealed Sentencing Recommendation]
  • November 01, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 12, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 18, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 18, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2017: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 18, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Case Reopened]
  • June 08, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Dismissal of Counts]
  • October 20, 2015: [Judgment]
  • October 14, 2015: [2255 Motion Filed]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 13, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 13, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2015: [Dismiss ]
  • October 13, 2015: [Acceptance of Responsibility]
August, 2015
  • August 21, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 06, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 03, 2015: [Restitution Order]
July, 2015
  • July 31, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • July 31, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • July 30, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
  • July 29, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 29, 2015: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 29, 2015: [Restitution Order]
  • July 29, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • July 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 28, 2015: [Extension of Time]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 23, 2015: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • July 22, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 22, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2015: [Transcript]
  • July 06, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2015
  • June 22, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 17, 2015: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2015: [Calendar Entry]
March, 2015
  • March 05, 2015: [Suppress]
February, 2015
  • February 10, 2015: [Prob 12C Petition for Warrant / Summons]
June, 2014
  • June 30, 2014: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 17, 2014: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.