U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00209-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Calendar Entry]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 19, 2022: [USM Return Executed]
  • January 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Prob 12A Report On Offender Under Supervision]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [USM Return Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2020: [Appear]
  • July 02, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Sealed Violation Recommendation]
  • March 23, 2020: [Violation Report]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 18, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
June, 2014
  • June 18, 2014: [2255 Motion Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.